This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 06/04/2022 at 05:09:51 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. BRANDI TICE

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRANDI TICE. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KENDALL, STEVEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0137

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KENDALL, STEVEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

TICE, BRANDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MUELLER, DAVID

Attorney at LOVE BEAL & NIXON

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION

07/14/2021: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SK)

11/02/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SK)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EMPLOYER'S ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUANCE OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MUELLER, DAVID