This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 01/15/2023 at 21:47:24 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V. ATHENA RIGGLE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ATHENA RIGGLE. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Statewide, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0043

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

RIGGLE, ATHENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COOLEY, NEIL

P.O Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

01/21/2020: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.)

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

03/26/2020: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILE PROOF OF SERVICE - SERVED 3-7-20

03/23/2020: FILE PROOF OF SERVICE - SERVED 3-7-20

FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

06/16/2020: FILE JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/26/2020: FILE CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT-TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

11/03/2022: FILE GARNISHMENT AFFIDAVIT-TINKER FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER

12/09/2022: FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GARNISHEE'S ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE GARN. SUMM.; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (UNDER $10,000.); Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less