This case was last updated from Kiowa County Courts on 01/08/2023 at 17:46:41 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC. V. AMBER OUSLEY

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against AMBER OUSLEY. This case was filed in Kiowa County Courts, Kiowa County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVERETT, BRAD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0058

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Kiowa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

LEVERETT, BRAD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC.

Defendant

OUSLEY, AMBER

 

Court Documents

FILED & ENTER PETITION

12/20/2021: FILED & ENTER PETITION

FILED ANSWER

01/07/2022: FILED ANSWER

FILED AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

01/20/2022: FILED AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILED ORIGINAL SUMMONS W/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

01/21/2022: FILED ORIGINAL SUMMONS W/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

FILED AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

03/21/2022: FILED AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

FILED CERTIICATE OF MAILING

04/04/2022: FILED CERTIICATE OF MAILING

FILED RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND

10/11/2022: FILED RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE & SAFISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED CERTIICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED AGREED JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMBER OUSLEY ON 1-6-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED ORIGINAL SUMMONS W/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT (NEW 7-1-04); Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less