This case was last updated from Kiowa County Courts on 10/09/2022 at 13:58:37 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC. V. AMBER OUSLEY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against AMBER OUSLEY. This case was filed in Kiowa County Courts, Kiowa County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MARSH, RICKY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0055

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Kiowa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MARSH, RICKY A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC.

Defendant

OUSLEY, AMBER

 

Court Documents

FILED & ENTER PETITION

12/01/2021: FILED & ENTER PETITION

FILED ANSWER

12/13/2021: FILED ANSWER

FILED ORIGINAL SUMMONS W/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

12/21/2021: FILED ORIGINAL SUMMONS W/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

FILED AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

12/27/2021: FILED AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

FILING OF MOTION OR APPLICATION

02/14/2022: FILING OF MOTION OR APPLICATION

FILED NOTICE OF HEARING

02/24/2022: FILED NOTICE OF HEARING

FILED ORDER FOR HEARING

09/16/2022: FILED ORDER FOR HEARING

FILED NOTICE OF HEARING

09/28/2022: FILED NOTICE OF HEARING

FILED WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/07/2022: FILED WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED ORDER FOR HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILING OF MOTION OR APPLICATION; Amount: $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AMBER OUSLEY ON 12-10-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED ORIGINAL SUMMONS W/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT (NEW 7-1-04); Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILED & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less