This case was last updated from Comanche County Courts on 04/15/2022 at 14:58:37 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC, Plaintiff, v. JIM ALSOBROOK, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC, Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JIM ALSOBROOK, Defendant. This case was filed in Comanche County Courts, Comanche County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheperd, Grant. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-759

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Comanche, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Sheperd, Grant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ALSOBROOK, JIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOLEY, NEIL

P O Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE;; Party Details; Plaintiff: LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1; Party: LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCode: DWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Docket: Grant Sheperd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCode: O; Description: COURT ORDER // JUDGE SHEPERD; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT OF SCHEDULING DOCKET // ??; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SCHEDULING DOCKET / 11-15-2021; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCode: AFD; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCode: A; Description: ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT SET: 11-15-2021 @ 9:00 AM; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT); Filed By: LVNV FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOLEY, NEIL