This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 06:24:50 (UTC).

LOYAL LOANS V. HAROLD THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 LOYAL LOANS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HAROLD THOMPSON. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROOKS, CARSON M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROOKS, CARSON M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOYAL LOANS

Defendant

THOMPSON, HAROLD

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER FILED

01/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER FILED

ALIAS AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER, FILED

02/27/2022: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER, FILED

PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER RETURN, FILED

04/18/2022: PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER RETURN, FILED

C/MINUTE, FILED - DEFAULT JUDGMENT:534.80 PLUS 128CC

04/25/2022: C/MINUTE, FILED - DEFAULT JUDGMENT:534.80 PLUS 128CC

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOMESTIC REC'T RETURN AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONTINUING GARNISHEE SUMMONS ISSUED CERT. MAIL; Amount: $ 11.42

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFF. W/ORDER ISSUED PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFF. WITH ORDER, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER ISSUED PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFF. W/ORDER ISSUED PPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT WITH ORDER FILED; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less