This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 02:18:21 (UTC).

Louis A Ruiz, Plaintiff, v. Linda M. Vangorp and Robert M. Vangorp, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Louis A Ruiz, Plaintiff, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Linda M Vangorp and Robert M Vangorp, Defendant. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Timmons, Aletia Haynes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-155

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Timmons, Aletia Haynes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruiz, Louis A

Defendants

Vangorp, Robert M

Vangorp, Linda M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brockett, B J

12704 Arrowhead Drive

Okc, OK 73120

Defendant Attorneys

Christian, Jennifer Kristin

709 Cooper'S Hawk

Norman, OK 73072

Larimore, James K.

920 North Harvey

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/04/2020: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

09/17/2020: PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/05/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER

05/29/2020: ANSWER

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

07/09/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/22/2020: ORDER ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

08/27/2020: DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ON PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(In Person); Docket: Aletia Haynes Timmons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE TIMMONS: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - PURSUANT TO DISTRICT COURT RULE 4(H), THE COURT RULES ON BRIEFS AND FIND THE MOTION IS DENIED AS PER JOURNAL ENTRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET 9/10/2020 IS CONTINUED BY MOVANT TO 10/1/2020 @ 9 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE AND OBJECTION TO PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-4850259 ON 08/04/2020. PAYOR: J TERRENCE PANSZA PLLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 50.00. LINE ITEMS: CV-2020-155: $50.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MOSJ; Description: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount: $ 50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CERTS; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: QUIET; Description: QUIET TITLE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL MISC. INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: QUIET TITLE(QUIET); Filed By: Ruiz, Louis A; Disposed: Pending.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less