This case was last updated from Comanche County Courts on 04/26/2022 at 12:00:54 (UTC).

Lori Merritt, Plaintiff, and Mary Brazzel, Plaintiff, v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Defendant.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2018 Lori Merritt, Plaintiff, and Mary Brazzel, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc , Defendant. This case was filed in Comanche County Courts, Comanche County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Newburn, Irma. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-491

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Comanche, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Newburn, Irma

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brazzel, Mary

Merritt, Lori

Defendant

WalMart Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROW, STEVEN W

6812 N Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73116

Defendant Attorneys

BREWER, MICHAEL W

Attorney at HILTGEN & BREWER P.C.

9505 N Kelley Ave

Okla City, OK 73131

Jeffrey D. Scott

9505 N. Kelley Ave.

Okc, OK 73131

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Judge; Party Details

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCode: DISPDWOP; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE / JUDGE NEWBURN; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE / JUDGE NEWBURN; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Docket: Irma Newburn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCode: SO; Description: AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER / JUDGE NEWBURN PTC SET 4-30-19 @ 1:30PM TRIAL TO BE SET AT PTC; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • HearingEvent: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Docket: Irma Newburn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT OF SCHEDULING DOCKET / STEVEN CROW; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCode: RECP; Description: RECEIPT OF SCHEDULING DOCKET / #11769; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / JEFFREY D. SCOTT FOR WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE / MICHAEL W. BREWER FOR WAL-MART STORES EAST, L.P.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: NEGL; Description: NEGLIGENCE (GENERAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: NEGLIGENCE (GENERAL)(NEGL); Filed By: Merritt, Lori

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey D. Scott