This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 09:28:01 (UTC).

Clavelle, Shonette Administratrix of the Estate of Barbara Long v. Stillwater Nursing Center LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Clavelle, Shonette Administratrix of the Estate of Barbara Long filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Stillwater Nursing Center LLC. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Kistler, Stephen R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-459

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Kistler, Stephen R

 

Party Details

Decedents and Plaintiffs

Long, Barbara

Clavelle, Shonette

Defendants

Amity Care LLC

Stillwater Nursing Center LLC

Richmond, Jennifer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Francis, Robert William

2824 Foxcroft #33

Little Rock, AR 72227

Moss, Brent Lee

Attorney at Reddick Moss PLLC

One Information Way, Suite 105

Little Rock, AR 72202

Reddick, Brian David

Attorney at Reddick Moss PLLC

One Information Way, Suite 105

Little Rock, AR 72202

Defendant Attorneys

Fagin, Kasey Kyle

Attorney at Best and Sharp

Williams Center Tower I, One West Third Street, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Mihelich, Andrew Collier

Williams Center Tower 1, One West Third Street, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Leblanc, Thomas Adrian

Williams Center Tower I, One West Third Street Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION

12/18/2020: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

01/04/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

01/04/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - ROBERT FRANCIS FOR PLAIN

12/28/2020: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - ROBERT FRANCIS FOR PLAIN

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

01/04/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLAIN (JUDGE KISTLER)

04/15/2022: ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLAIN (JUDGE KISTLER)

MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAIN

04/13/2022: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAIN

SUGGESTION OF DEATH ON THE RECORD

04/13/2022: SUGGESTION OF DEATH ON THE RECORD

MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAIN

04/11/2022: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAIN

SUGGESTION OF DEATH ON THE RECORD

04/11/2022: SUGGESTION OF DEATH ON THE RECORD

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

10/08/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD (JUDGE KISTLER)

09/16/2021: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD (JUDGE KISTLER)

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

09/15/2021: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

PLAIN 'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO RICHMOND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

05/10/2021: PLAIN 'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO RICHMOND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

DEFENDANT, JENNIFER RICHMOND'S, SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

04/19/2021: DEFENDANT, JENNIFER RICHMOND'S, SPECIAL ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

SUMMONS RETURNED/SERVED JENNIFER RICHMOND PERSONALLY ON 4-1-2021/PPS

04/16/2021: SUMMONS RETURNED/SERVED JENNIFER RICHMOND PERSONALLY ON 4-1-2021/PPS

DEFENDANTS STILLWATER NURSING CENTER AND AMITY CARE, LLC'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

03/18/2021: DEFENDANTS STILLWATER NURSING CENTER AND AMITY CARE, LLC'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

PLAIN 'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

03/04/2021: PLAIN 'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Party: Clavelle,Shonette; Docket: Stephen R Kistler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISPOSITION HEARING DOCKET; Plain 's motion to substitute party plain; Party: Clavelle,Shonette; Docket: Stephen R Kistler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE KISTLER: THE PLAIN APPEARS BY ATTORNEY, ROBERT FRANCIS. THE DEFENDANT APPEARS BY ATTORNEY. THE PLAIN 'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE IS SUSTAINED PURSUANT TO THE ORDER PRESENTED AND SIGNED IN COURT THIS DATE. THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS SET FOR HEARING JUNE 17, 2022 AT 9:00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLAIN (JUDGE KISTLER); Party: Clavelle, Shonette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAIN; Party: Clavelle, Shonette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUGGESTION OF DEATH ON THE RECORD; Party: Long, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAIN; Party: Long, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUGGESTION OF DEATH ON THE RECORD; Party: Long, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: EAA; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Party: Stillwater Nursing Center LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL OF RECORD (JUDGE KISTLER); Party: Stillwater Nursing Center LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCode: NEGL; Description: NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: NEGLIGENCE(NEGL); Filed By: Long, Barbara; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less