This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 04:44:41 (UTC).

Locke Supply Co VS Ellis, Shawn M Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Locke Supply Co filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ellis, Shawn M. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Brockman, Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1414

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Brockman, Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Locke Supply Co

Defendants

Ellis, Shawn M

Second Opinion Plumbing Heating & Air Conditioning Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MURPHY, ANDREW P

Po Box 18312

Oklahoma City, OK 73154

 

Court Documents

PETITION

05/31/2018: PETITION

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

07/09/2018: AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/09/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SFB)

07/11/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SFB)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/11/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/12/2018: MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ORDER VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SFB)

07/12/2018: ORDER VACATING DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SFB)

RECALL OF CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/13/2018: RECALL OF CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SECOND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/26/2018: SECOND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SFB

07/27/2018: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT - SFB

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

07/27/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFAULT JUDGMENT

APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO APPEAR AND ANSWER CONCERNING ITS PROPERTY AND FORBIDDING A TRANSFER OR OTHER DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY

03/12/2020: APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTOR TO APPEAR AND ANSWER CONCERNING ITS PROPERTY AND FORBIDDING A TRANSFER OR OTHER DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY

ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS AND FORBIDDING A TRANSFER OR OTHER DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY

03/12/2020: ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS AND FORBIDDING A TRANSFER OR OTHER DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY

SO: (04-15-20) DUE TO COVID-19, HOA SET 4/29/20 IS RESET TO 6/10/20 @ 3:00PM. *** SFB ***

04/29/2020: SO: (04-15-20) DUE TO COVID-19, HOA SET 4/29/20 IS RESET TO 6/10/20 @ 3:00PM. *** SFB ***

SO: (6-10-20) HOA STRICKEN AS NO APPEARANCE. *** SFB ***

06/16/2020: SO: (6-10-20) HOA STRICKEN AS NO APPEARANCE. *** SFB ***

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: SO: (6-10-20) HOA STRICKEN AS NO APPEARANCE. *** SFB ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • HearingEvent: ASSET HEARING; Docket: Scott Brockman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: SO: (04-15-20) DUE TO COVID-19, HOA SET 4/29/20 IS RESET TO 6/10/20 @ 3:00PM. *** SFB ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2020-1125570 ON 03/12/2020. PAYOR: ANDREW P MURPHY TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 76.64. LINE ITEMS: CS-2018-1414: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CS-2018-1414: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-1414: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CS-2018-1414: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-1414: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CS-2018-1414: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-1414: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CS-2018-1414: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER TO APPEAR AND ANSWER AS TO ASSETS AND FORBIDDING A TRANSFER OR OTHER DISPOSITION OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: INDEBT; Description: INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF LESS THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: INDEBTEDNESS(INDEBT)

    Read MoreRead Less