This case was last updated from Rogers County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 03:10:13 (UTC).

Lauren Kolar, Plaintiff, v. Tracey D Ann Smith a/k/a Tracey D Smith a/k/a Tracey Smith Defendant, and John Doe, Defendant, and Jane Doe, Defendants.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Lauren Kolar, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Tracey D Ann Smith a/k/a Tracey D Smith a/k/a Tracey Smith Defendant, and John Doe, Defendant, and Jane Doe, Defendants. This case was filed in Rogers County Courts, Rogers County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Condren, Sheila A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1-44

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Rogers, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Condren, Sheila A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kolar, Lauren

Defendants

Smith, Tracey D Ann

Smith, Tracey D

Smith, Robert C

Smith, Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Truskett, John P

Attorney at Truskett Law Firm, PLLC

2921 East 91St Street South, Suite 100

Tulsa, OK 74137

Defendant Attorney

Coates, Stephen M

Attorney at Wilson Cain & Acquaviva

1717 South Boulder Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

PETITION

02/22/2021: PETITION

JUDGE CONDREN: NO CR: PLTF PRESENT THROUGH ATTY SAM PERRINE. DFT PRESENT THROUGH ATTY STEVEN COATS. DFT MOTION TO STRIKE IS RESOLVED IN THE FOLLOWING WAY: PLTF'S COUNSEL WITHDRAWS WITNESSES PARCHURI, WILSON AND TENISON. REGARDING THE BEFORE AND AFTER

05/19/2022: JUDGE CONDREN: NO CR: PLTF PRESENT THROUGH ATTY SAM PERRINE. DFT PRESENT THROUGH ATTY STEVEN COATS. DFT MOTION TO STRIKE IS RESOLVED IN THE FOLLOWING WAY: PLTF'S COUNSEL WITHDRAWS WITNESSES PARCHURI, WILSON AND TENISON. REGARDING THE BEFORE AND AFTER WITNESSES AS WELL AS TREATING PHYSICIANS, PLTF TO DECIDE WHICH ONES WILL ACTUALLY BE USED IN TRIAL AND NOTIFY DFT'S COUNSEL WITHIN TWO WEEKS OF TODAYS DATE. DFT ALLOWED TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY AS TO THESE WITNESSES ONLY. DISCOVERY TO BE COMPLETED BY 7-31-22. CONT'D PT SET 8-4-22 @ 2:30PM.

ORDER

03/30/2022: ORDER

DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN REPLY TO PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN TRIAL WITNESSES

03/30/2022: DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN REPLY TO PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN TRIAL WITNESSES

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MMOTION TO STRIKE WITNESSES

03/29/2022: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MMOTION TO STRIKE WITNESSES

JUDGE CONDREN: PTC/MOTION TO STRIKE SET 5-19-22 @ 2:30PM. ORDER TO BE DRAWN BY DEF.

03/09/2022: JUDGE CONDREN: PTC/MOTION TO STRIKE SET 5-19-22 @ 2:30PM. ORDER TO BE DRAWN BY DEF.

DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN TRIAL WITNESSES AND COMBINED BRIEF IN SUPPORT

03/09/2022: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN TRIAL WITNESSES AND COMBINED BRIEF IN SUPPORT

OFFER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT

03/09/2022: OFFER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT

ORDER

12/14/2021: ORDER

PLAIN 'S SUR REPLY

12/10/2021: PLAIN 'S SUR REPLY

JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

12/09/2021: JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

JUDGE CONDREN: PER PHONE REQUEST OF BOTH PARTIES, PTC IS STRICKEN AND CONT'D TO 3-9-2022 @ 2:30PM.

12/08/2021: JUDGE CONDREN: PER PHONE REQUEST OF BOTH PARTIES, PTC IS STRICKEN AND CONT'D TO 3-9-2022 @ 2:30PM.

ORDER

11/18/2021: ORDER

DEFENDANT ROBERT SMITH'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAIN 'S MOTION TO FILE SUR-REPLY

11/05/2021: DEFENDANT ROBERT SMITH'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAIN 'S MOTION TO FILE SUR-REPLY

PLAIN 'S MOTION TO FILE A SUR-REPLY

10/29/2021: PLAIN 'S MOTION TO FILE A SUR-REPLY

DEFENDANT ROBERT SMITH'S BRIEF IN REPLY TO PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/18/2021: DEFENDANT ROBERT SMITH'S BRIEF IN REPLY TO PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLAIN 'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONCERNING PUNITIVE DAMAGES, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

10/12/2021: PLAIN 'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONCERNING PUNITIVE DAMAGES, NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT, AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT

DEFENDANTS' FINAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

09/27/2021: DEFENDANTS' FINAL WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: (CONT'D) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Docket: Sheila A. Condren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE / DEF MOTION TO STRIKE; Docket: Sheila A. Condren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE CONDREN: NO CR: PLTF PRESENT THROUGH ATTY SAM PERRINE. DFT PRESENT THROUGH ATTY STEVEN COATS. DFT MOTION TO STRIKE IS RESOLVED IN THE FOLLOWING WAY: PLTF'S COUNSEL WITHDRAWS WITNESSES PARCHURI, WILSON AND TENISON. REGARDING THE BEFORE AND AFTER WITNESSES AS WELL AS TREATING PHYSICIANS, PLTF TO DECIDE WHICH ONES WILL ACTUALLY BE USED IN TRIAL AND NOTIFY DFT'S COUNSEL WITHIN TWO WEEKS OF TODAYS DATE. DFT ALLOWED TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY AS TO THESE WITNESSES ONLY. DISCOVERY TO BE COMPLETED BY 7-31-22. CONT'D PT SET 8-4-22 @ 2:30PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: B; Description: DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN REPLY TO PLAIN 'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN TRIAL WITNESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RESP; Description: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MMOTION TO STRIKE WITNESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingEvent: (CONT'D) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Docket: Sheila A. Condren

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE CONDREN: PTC/MOTION TO STRIKE SET 5-19-22 @ 2:30PM. ORDER TO BE DRAWN BY DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN TRIAL WITNESSES AND COMBINED BRIEF IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OFFER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: AUTONEG; Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: AUTO NEGLIGENCE(AUTONEG); Filed By: Kolar, Lauren; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less