This case was last updated from Le Flore County Courts on 04/28/2022 at 20:31:27 (UTC).

KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC V. LEAH GREEN

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against LEAH GREEN. This case was filed in Le Flore County Courts, Le Flore County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is SULLIVAN, JONATHAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0026

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Le Flore, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

SULLIVAN, JONATHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINO FINANCIAL CO LLC

Defendant

GREEN, LEAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CLARK, LEAH

Po Box 808

Edmond, OK 73083

 

Court Documents

FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

04/25/2022: FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE RESONSE TO ALLEGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER CONTINUING CASE AS OPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE AS OPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clark, Leah