This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 06/26/2022 at 07:20:04 (UTC).

KIM FORD, Plaintiff, vs. RAW CRUDE OIL AND GAS LLC, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 KIM FORD, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against RAW CRUDE OIL AND GAS LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Newby, Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-12

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Newby, Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD, KIM I

Defendant

RAW CRUDE OIL AND GAS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L, EDIGER ROGER

Attorney at MITCHELL DECLERCK PLLC

202 West Broadway

Enid, OK 73701

 

Court Documents

PETITION

01/19/2022: PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

01/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED - MAILED BY ATTORNEY

SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: OKLAHOMA SECRETARY OF STATE 1/20/22 CERT MAIL

01/31/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: OKLAHOMA SECRETARY OF STATE 1/20/22 CERT MAIL

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

03/11/2022: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ISSUED

04/14/2022: WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ISSUED

RETURN GENERAL WRIT OF EXECUTION

04/21/2022: RETURN GENERAL WRIT OF EXECUTION

NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FROM ROGER L EDIGER BY USPS ON 5-25-2022 TO OKLAHOMA SECRETARY OF STATE

05/26/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FROM ROGER L EDIGER BY USPS ON 5-25-2022 TO OKLAHOMA SECRETARY OF STATE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: SERV; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FROM ROGER L EDIGER BY USPS ON 5-25-2022 TO OKLAHOMA SECRETARY OF STATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOSS; Description: NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN GENERAL WRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-516780 ON 04/14/2022. PAYOR: MITCHELL DECLERCK TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 126.64. LINE ITEMS: CJ-2022-12: $33.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. CJ-2022-12: $50.00 ON AC08 SHERIFF FEES. CJ-2022-12: $0.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-12: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. CJ-2022-12: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-12: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. CJ-2022-12: $0.98 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-12: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. CJ-2022-12: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: WAIS; Description: WRIT OF ASSISTANCE ISSUED; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: CCADMIN04; Description: COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: CCRMPF; Description: COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN05; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $5 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: DCADMIN155; Description: DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON $1.55 COLLECTIONS; Amount: $ 0.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCode: SJFIS; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND - INTERPRETER AND TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: CANCEL; Description: CANCELLATION OF LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: CANCELLATION OF LEASE(CANCEL); Filed By: FORD, KIM I

    Read MoreRead Less