This case was last updated from Logan County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 05:23:52 (UTC).

Kenneth Hatchel and Cynthia Hatche, as Grandparents and Next Friends of Kenneth Sears, minor child v. Blakeley Huskey

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 Kenneth Hatchel and Cynthia Hatche, as Grandparents and Next Friends of Kenneth Sears, minor child filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Blakeley Huskey. This case was filed in Logan County Courts, Logan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Duel, Louis A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-141

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Logan, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Duel, Louis A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hatchel, Cynthia

Hatchel, Kenneth V.

Defendant

Huskey, Blakeley

Minor

Sears, Kenneth Andrew

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sloan, Christopher P

5100 N Brookline Ave Suite 825

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

 

Court Documents

PETITION

07/26/2018: PETITION

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINITFFS' PETITION

08/15/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINITFFS' PETITION

JOINT APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

08/30/2018: JOINT APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER

10/05/2018: ORDER

ORDER FOR TRUST

10/05/2018: ORDER FOR TRUST

COPY OF ORDER

10/17/2018: COPY OF ORDER

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/17/2018: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Huskey, Blakeley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Party: Hatchel, Kenneth V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: COPY OF ORDER; Party: Hatchel, Kenneth V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: PLAIN 'S JOINT APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT; Party: Hatchel,KennethV.; Docket: Louis A Duel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT; Judge; Party Details; Defendant: Huskey, Blakeley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER FOR TRUST; Party: Hatchel, Kenneth V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER; Party: Hatchel, Kenneth V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE DUEL- CASE COMES ON FOR JOINT APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. THE PLAIN S APPEAR IN PERSON WITH ATTORNEY CHRIS SLOAN. THE DEFENDANT APPEARS BY COUNSEL. THE PLAIN S ARE SWORN AND TESTIFY. THE COURT SUSTAINS THE APPLICATION AND APPROVES THE SETTLEMENT PER JOURNAL ENTRY ENTERED THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: APLI; Description: JOINT APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Party: Hatchel, Kenneth V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINITFFS' PETITION; Party: Huskey, Blakeley

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketCode: AUTONEG; Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Count: 1; Party: Hatchel, Kenneth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: AUTO NEGLIGENCE(AUTONEG); Filed By: Hatchel, Kenneth

    Read MoreRead Less