This case was last updated from Osage County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 05:53:37 (UTC).

KATHIE BEASTON V. RICHARD LEE

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 KATHIE BEASTON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RICHARD LEE. This case was filed in Osage County Courts, Osage County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERILL, CINDY A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0015

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Osage, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERILL, CINDY A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEASTON, KATHIE

Defendant

LEE, RICHARD

 

Court Documents

VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE

01/20/2021: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE

AFFIDAVIT/ORDER

01/20/2021: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: N. SPERRY, OK 74073.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AWARDED POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY:1628 W. 113TH ST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM; CAP; PLTF PRESENT. F.E.D. SERVICE IS GOOD. PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CT MINUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: TO 2-23-2021 @ 9AM BY AGREEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM; CAP; PLTF BY PHONE.DEFT BY PHONE. F.E.D. CASE CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT RETURNED SERVING RICHARD LEE ON 1-22-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER ISSUED BY OCSO FOR RESP; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT/ORDER; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less