This case was last updated from Ottawa County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 03:45:43 (UTC).

JP MORGAN MORGAN MORTGAGE V. JOHN DOE, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 JP MORGAN MORGAN MORTGAGE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOHN DOE. This case was filed in Ottawa County Courts, Ottawa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HANEY, ROBERT G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0074

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Ottawa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HANEY, ROBERT G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JP MORGAN MORGAN MORTGAGE

Defendants

YATES, MARY A

SPOUSE IF ANY;

DOE, JOHN

OCCUPANT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PETERSON, LESLE BAILEY

770 Ne 63Rd St

Oklahoma City, OK 73105

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

01/09/2019: NOTICE OF SHERIFF'S SALE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • HearingEvent: CIVIL-COURT CLERK TRACKING ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SALE CONFIRMED IN OPEN COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: WERE NO APPEARANCES REPRESENTED FROM THE DEFT, SHERIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM BD MATTER COMES ON FOR HEARING ON FORECLOSURE, THERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER CONFIRMING SHERIFFS SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON CONFIRMATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFFS SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFF RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND- EFFECTIVE 1-1-05; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FORECLOSURE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR OVER 10,000; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less