This case was last updated from Osage County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 07:23:53 (UTC).

JOSE L. GONZALEZ V. CAMARENA, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 JOSE L GONZALEZ filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CAMARENA, INC. This case was filed in Osage County Courts, Osage County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KANE, M JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0157

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Osage, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KANE, M JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ, JOSE L.

Defendant

CAMARENA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FRASIER & FRASIER

Attorney at FRASIER & FRASIER

1700 Southwest Boulevard Suite 100, Po Box 799

Tulsa, OK 74101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVING CAMARENA, INC. 8.22.2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INC. C/O ANGEL PEREZ CAMARENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED BACK TO ATTY FOR SERVICE ON CAMARENA,; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less