This case was last updated from McClain County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 03:30:32 (UTC).

JOHN WILLIAM CHILVERS III, ET. AL. V. TULSA REALTY DEV. AUTH. LLC

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 JOHN WILLIAM CHILVERS III filed an Other lawsuit against TULSA REALTY DEV AUTH LLC. This case was filed in McClain County Courts, McClain County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARDS, LEAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0060

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    McClain, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARDS, LEAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHILVERS, JOHN WILLIAM III

C & C ALLOYS PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant

TULSA REALTY DEV. AUTH. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SAHEB, EDWARD

1025 Sw 4Th St Ste 200

Moore, OK 73160

TODD, JEFF L.

Attorney at MCAFEE & TAFT

211 N. Robinson, 10Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

SO: LS /DEFT, AMONG OTHER PLEADINGS, HAS FILED A

04/22/2021: SO: LS /DEFT, AMONG OTHER PLEADINGS, HAS FILED A

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/07/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT TO MOVE THIS COURT TO

05/10/2021: SPECIAL APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT TO MOVE THIS COURT TO

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

DEFT'S EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE

05/12/2021: DEFT'S EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE

SO: RE /THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR HEARING. HEARING IN

05/12/2021: SO: RE /THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR HEARING. HEARING IN

DEFENDANT TULSA REALTY DEVELOPMENT AUT LLC'S REPLY TO

06/01/2021: DEFENDANT TULSA REALTY DEVELOPMENT AUT LLC'S REPLY TO

MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY HEARING ON DEFT'S MOTION

06/21/2021: MOTION TO SETTLE JOURNAL ENTRY HEARING ON DEFT'S MOTION

JOURNAL ENTRY

07/07/2021: JOURNAL ENTRY

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS ON DEFT'S SPEC APPEARANCE &

07/12/2021: TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS ON DEFT'S SPEC APPEARANCE &

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/26/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/27/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

APPLICATION FOR ATTY FEES & COSTS & SUPPORTING BRIEF

07/27/2021: APPLICATION FOR ATTY FEES & COSTS & SUPPORTING BRIEF

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: APPLICATION FOR ATTY. FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO SETTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VOUCHER; Amount: $ 49,700.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: POUNDAGE; Amount: $ 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED ORDER DISPURSING FUNDS HELD BY THE COURT AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLICATION FOR ATTY FEES & COSTS & SUPPORTING BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EXCEEDING $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM IN THE ALTERNATE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFENDANT'S SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COUNTER CLAIM OF DEFENDANT ONLY IN THE ALTERNATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STENO FEE; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION TO TRANSFER; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIF. OF COMPLIANCE W/SECTION 4024 OF THE CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER AFFIDAVIT & ISSUE SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd, Jeff L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saheb, Edward