This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 08:16:57 (UTC).

JOHN DEERE FINANCIAL F.S.B. V. AND, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 JOHN DEERE FINANCIAL F S B filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AND. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WEEDON, JILL C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WEEDON, JILL C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN DEERE FINANCIAL F.S.B.

Defendants

AND

SHEPHERD CATTLE COMPANY LLC

SHEPHERD, DARREL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JENKINS, JODY D.

Attorney at JENKINS & YOUNG P.C.

Po Box 420

Lubbock, TX 79408

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: SHEPHERD CATTLE CO

01/28/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTY TO SERVE: SHEPHERD CATTLE CO

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PLAIN 'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FIL & SCANNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: CIV TRACKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less