This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/13/2023 at 12:46:13 (UTC).

JOHN BYERS V. AMERICAN HOME SHIELD

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 JOHN BYERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMERICAN HOME SHIELD. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Pottawatomie, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0092

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BYERS, JOHN

Defendant

AMERICAN HOME SHIELD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SPENCER, J. SHAWN

FERGUSON, THOMAS G JR

 

Court Documents

FILE ANSWER

03/30/2022: FILE ANSWER

FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

03/16/2022: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.)

FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- AMERICAN HOME SHIELD, CERTIFIED

03/23/2022: FILE SUMMONS & RETURN- AMERICAN HOME SHIELD, CERTIFIED

FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- THOMAS G. FERGUSON JR

03/30/2022: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE- THOMAS G. FERGUSON JR

FILE MOTION TO ENTER

06/16/2022: FILE MOTION TO ENTER

FILE AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER- 3-9-2023 AT 3:00PM

07/28/2022: FILE AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER- 3-9-2023 AT 3:00PM

FILE JOINT MOTION FOR AMENDED SCHEDULIG ORDER

02/01/2023: FILE JOINT MOTION FOR AMENDED SCHEDULIG ORDER

FILE SCHEDULING ORDER- PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 8-23-23 AT

02/03/2023: FILE SCHEDULING ORDER- PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 8-23-23 AT

FILE SCHEDULING ORDER- SCHEDULING ORDER- 9-7-23 AT

02/28/2023: FILE SCHEDULING ORDER- SCHEDULING ORDER- 9-7-23 AT

 

Docket Entries

09/07/2023

HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 3:00PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SCHEDULING ORDER- SCHEDULING ORDER- 9-7-23 AT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 4:00PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE SCHEDULING ORDER- PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 8-23-23 AT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE JOINT MOTION FOR AMENDED SCHEDULIG ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER- 3-9-2023 AT 3:00PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION (OVER $10,000.); Amount: $ 163.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less