This case was last updated from Cleveland County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 04:40:38 (UTC).

Jessica Owens, Plaintiff, v. Daniel Killman, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2018 Jessica Owens, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Daniel Killman, Defendant. This case was filed in Cleveland County Courts, Cleveland County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Virgin, Jeff. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-722

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Cleveland, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Virgin, Jeff

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Owens, Jessica

Defendant

Killman, Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALLAGHER, SCOTT

Attorney at LITTLE, OLIVER & GALLAGHER

One West Main

Ardmore, OK 73401

 

Court Documents

PETITION

05/31/2018: PETITION

DANIEL KILLMAN'S ANSWER TO PLAIN 'S PETITION

07/27/2018: DANIEL KILLMAN'S ANSWER TO PLAIN 'S PETITION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/01/2018: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

09/04/2018: MOTION FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - JV / SET 10/1/18 @ 9:00AM

09/11/2018: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - JV / SET 10/1/18 @ 9:00AM

ORDER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT TO BE TAKEN

09/18/2018: ORDER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT TO BE TAKEN

OFFER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT TO BE TAKEN

12/20/2018: OFFER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT TO BE TAKEN

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

04/10/2019: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED - WITH PREJUDICE; Dismissed- Settled; Party Details

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPCVDMWP; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OFRJ; Description: OFFER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT TO BE TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER TO ALLOW JUDGMENT TO BE TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - JV / SET 10/1/18 @ 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MO; Description: MOTION FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CM; Description: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED / PPS / DANIEL KILLMAN / SERVED ON 7-11-18; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office; Party: Killman, Daniel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: A; Description: DANIEL KILLMAN'S ANSWER TO PLAIN 'S PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCode: SMS; Description: SUMMONS RETURNED, SERVED: PPS/ DANIEL KILLMAN BY LEAVING WITH SHERRY KILLMAN @ RESIDENCE- 7-11-18; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: AUTONEG; Description: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CIVIL RELIEF MORE THAN $10,000 INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: AUTO NEGLIGENCE(AUTONEG)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALLAGHER, SCOTT