This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 04/01/2022 at 05:42:02 (UTC).

JENNIFER MARTIN-BOTHA V. STATE FARM MUT AUTO INS CO, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 JENNIFER MARTIN-BOTHA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE FARM MUT AUTO INS CO. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is KIRKLAND, KORY S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0106

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

KIRKLAND, KORY S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOTHA-MARTIN, JENNIFER

MARTIN-BOTHA, JENNIFER

Defendants

HICKSON, THOMAS J

STATE FARM MUT AUTO INS CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MELOT, JOHN P.

1601 E. Veterans Memorial Highway, P.O. Box 1609

Blanchard, OK 73010

MOLINSKY, BILL J.

Attorney at MOLINSKY LAW FIRM, P.C.

2600 Covell Village Drive, Suite 110

Edmond, OK 73003

CAIN, TIM D.

Attorney at WILSON CAIN & ACQUAVIVA

300 N W 13Th Street, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

WALOS, KEVIN M.

Attorney at WILSON CAIN & ACQUAVIVA

300 Nw 13Th Street, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

GOFTON, ROGER K.

Attorney at WILSON CAIN & ACQUAVIVA

300 N.W. 13Th Street, Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

 

Court Documents

PETITION

06/18/2021: PETITION

NOTICE OF HEARING- 8-12-21 @9AM

06/23/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING- 8-12-21 @9AM

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

06/30/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - NORMAN REGIONAL HEALTH

06/30/2021: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - NORMAN REGIONAL HEALTH

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - SABRE N. WEATHERS/MEDICAL LIEN

07/09/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - SABRE N. WEATHERS/MEDICAL LIEN

ANSWER

07/09/2021: ANSWER

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - BILL MOLINSKY/DEFT STATE FARM

07/20/2021: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - BILL MOLINSKY/DEFT STATE FARM

DEFT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

07/20/2021: DEFT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

09/07/2021: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER & RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 3 C.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR TRUST - 3 C.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER - 3 C.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HICKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - ROGER K. GOFTON/DEFT THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JOINT APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1-1-2005; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOLINSKY, BILL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAIN, TIM D