This case was last updated from Pawnee County Courts on 04/02/2022 at 00:49:46 (UTC).

JEFFREY STILWELL V. C.C A MINOR, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 JEFFREY STILWELL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against C C A MINOR. This case was filed in Pawnee County Courts, Pawnee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERILL, PATRICK M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0032

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Pawnee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERILL, PATRICK M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STATE OF OKLAHOMA, EX REL

STILLWELL, JEFFREY

STILWELL, JEFFREY

Defendants

SANCHEZ, ALBERT

LAYMON, BRIDGETT AKA

SANCHEZ, BRIDGETT

C.C A MINOR

CLEMINSHIRE ROBERT C, PARENT

NEXT FRIEND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCGLASSON, SCOTT

Po Box 950391

Oklahoma City, OK 73195

PAUL, ELIZABETH

P.O. Box 950391

Oklahoma City, OK 73195

BENHAM, JONATHAN F

Attorney at RIFFEL LAW FIRM, PLLC

3517 W Owen K Garriott, Ste One

Enid, OK 73703

WOODS II, MAURICE G.

410 N.W. 13Th Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

 

Court Documents

FILE APPLICATION FOR STATE TAX ENFORCEMENT

06/10/2021: FILE APPLICATION FOR STATE TAX ENFORCEMENT

ISSUE SUMMONS RTA C.C. A MINOR, BY ROBERT C CLEMINSHIRE

06/28/2021: ISSUE SUMMONS RTA C.C. A MINOR, BY ROBERT C CLEMINSHIRE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ENTRY OF APPEARANCE-M. WOOD/S. WOODS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HER PARENT AND NEXT FRIEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS RTA C.C. A MINOR, BY ROBERT C CLEMINSHIRE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK RECOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAUL, ELIZABETH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGLASSON, SCOTT