This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 09:01:13 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC V. TIFFANY JOAN HOWARD

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against TIFFANY JOAN HOWARD. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BROOKS, CARSON M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0282

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BROOKS, CARSON M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

HOWARD, TIFFANY JOAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BOESE, KALEB

5200 S. Yale Ave Suite 505

Tulsa, OK 74135

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: RELEASE AND SAT. OF JUDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF JUDGMENT, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN AND RELEASE AND SATISFACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERITIFICATE OF MAILING OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, FI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND JOURNAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION, FILED; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOESE, KALEB