This case was last updated from Carter County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:20:16 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC V. CHARLES CARR

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CHARLES CARR. This case was filed in Carter County Courts, Carter County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0012

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Carter, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC

Defendant

CARR, CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COOLEY, NEIL

Po Box 32738

Oklahoma City, OK 73123

 

Court Documents

PETITION, FILED

01/12/2021: PETITION, FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAIN; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE, FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAIN; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURT CLERK PRESERVATION FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CHSC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION, FILED; Amount: $ 150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOLEY, NEIL