This case was last updated from Muskogee County Courts on 05/27/2022 at 04:34:28 (UTC).

JEFF WATKINS, ET. AL. V. ANGELICA MARIA SILENCE

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 JEFF WATKINS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANGELICA MARIA SILENCE. This case was filed in Muskogee County Courts, Muskogee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is STOUT, WELDON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0716

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Muskogee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

STOUT, WELDON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WATKINS, JEFF

WATKINS, NICOLE

Defendant

SILENCE, ANGELICA MARIA

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

09/02/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS

AFFIDAVIT OF WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL

09/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL

VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE CARES ACT

09/02/2021: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE CARES ACT

SHERIFFS RETURN

09/07/2021: SHERIFFS RETURN

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFFS RETURN (WRIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHERIFFS RETURN (ORDER TO VACATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 3.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.02

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -1.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: MONIES DUE THE FOLLOWING AGENCY(IES) REDUCED; Amount: $ -1.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: VERIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT & ORDER ISSUED SHERIFF IN COUNTY; Amount: $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT AND SUMMONS; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less