This case was last updated from Caddo County Courts on 05/26/2022 at 10:44:44 (UTC).

JASON GLIDEWELL V. DEBRAH LYNETTE CHENOWETH

Case Summary

On 06/27/2018 JASON GLIDEWELL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEBRAH LYNETTE CHENOWETH. This case was filed in Caddo County Courts, Caddo County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS, DAVID A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0189

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Caddo, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS, DAVID A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GLIDEWELL, JASON

Defendant

CHENOWETH, DEBRAH LYNETTE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CON'T GARINSHEE'S ANSWER $22.21 12-04-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CON'T GARNISHEE'S ANSWER $77.66 11-27-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CON'T GARNISHEE'S ANSWER $90.12 11-20-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CON'T GARNISHEE'S ANSWER $89.73 11-13-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CON'T GARNISHEE'S ANSWER $95.18 11-6-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CON'T GARNISHEE'S ANSWER $94.52 10-26-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CON'T GARNISHMENT ANSWER $93.08 10-23-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CON'T GARNISHMENT ANSWER $90.05 7-24-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHENOWETH 6-27-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT AND RETURN SERVED DEBRAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: IF SHERIFF SERVICE, ADD NAME OF COUNTY__________________

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADD SERVICE FEE -$10.00 MAIL OR $50.00 SHERIFF NO PPS FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE OR ISSUE SMALL CLAIMS AFFIDAVIT & ORDER-UP TO 1501.; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less