This case was last updated from Garvin County Courts on 06/04/2022 at 01:44:01 (UTC).

JAMES E COLLINS V. BOARD OF CO COMM GARVIN CO, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 JAMES E COLLINS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BOARD OF CO COMM GARVIN CO. This case was filed in Garvin County Courts, Garvin County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARDS, LEAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0106

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Garvin, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARDS, LEAH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLINS, JAMES E

Defendants

BERZAS, COREY

BERZAS, JENNIFER

BOARD OF CO COMM GARVIN CO

GOGGANS CO TREAS, SANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DILLINGHAM, CAROL PRICE

201 S Jones Suite 300

Norman, OK 73069

JONES, FOB F

1010 W 2Nd St

Sulphur, OK 73086

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE (LE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PD APPRS THIS DATE LESS PDG; Amount: $ 4.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE AND ORDER OF HEARING/AFFD OF PUB PVD $36.35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (LE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE AND ORDER OF HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFIRM SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: MOTION TO CONFIRM SHERIFFS SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RET'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SHFS SALE; APPRAISEMENT AND BILL OF APPRS; SHFS RETURN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPRAISEMENT OF PROPERTY; OATH OF APPRAISERS; NOTICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less