This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 10:35:27 (UTC).

JACKSON CO. MEMORIAL HOSPITAL V. MORGAN SMITH

Case Summary

On 05/22/2018 JACKSON CO MEMORIAL HOSPITAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MORGAN SMITH. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is WARREN, WINFORD MIKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

WARREN, WINFORD MIKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON CO. MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Defendant

SMITH, MORGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL JOURNAL ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT - SERVICE MEMBERS RELIEF ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (RETURN MADE ON COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED TO MORGAN SMITH 5/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (RETURNED TO ATTORNEY FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUE SUMMONS - MORGAN SMITH; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 2.48

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less