This case was last updated from Custer County Courts on 06/08/2022 at 04:12:03 (UTC).

INDIVIDUALLY AND, ET. AL. V. AND, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 08/21/2018 INDIVIDUALLY AND, filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against AND,. This case was filed in Custer County Courts, Custer County Courts located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HAUGHT, DOUG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0075

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Custer, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HAUGHT, DOUG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLEN, BRITTANY

AND

ALLEN, CHASE

INDIVIDUALLY AND

AS PARENT AND NEXT OF KIN OF

ALLEN, KAMBRY

A DECEASED MINOR;

Defendants and Plaintiffs

CLINTON HMA, LLC

D/B/A

AND

ALLIANCEHEALTH CLINTON

HENSLEY M.D., MICHAEL CLARKE

FAKHRY M.D., TANNOUS

KNAPP D.O., STACEY D

FEY M.D., VIC

BLAKEBURN M.D., ROBERT V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BICKHAM, SHANNON E

Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger, Po Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

BROOKS, MICHAEL A.

Attorney at THE BROOKS LAW FIRM

7100 N Classen Blvd Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73116

WALTERS, HILTON H

Attorney at RIFE WALTERS STANLEY & NATARAJAN LLP

1017 Nw 6Th Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

WIGGINS, JOHN

Attorney at WIGGINS SEWELL & OGLETREE

210 Park Avenue - 3100 Oklahoma Tower

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

HORNE, ELISE M

Attorney at GOOLSBY PROCTOR HEEFNER & GIBBS P.C.

701 N Broadway Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

VOSLER, ALEXANDER C.

Attorney at JOHNSON HANAN VOSLER HAWTHORNE & SNIDER

9801 N Broadway Extension

Oklahoma City, OK 73114

PICKAR, CASADY L

Attorney at FOLIART HUFF OTTAWAY & BOTTOM

201 Robert S Kerr Ave 12Th Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ROBERT V BLAKEBURN M.D. FIL &

12/10/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ROBERT V BLAKEBURN M.D. FIL &

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • HearingEvent: DISMISSED/SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • HearingEvent: STATUS DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SCHEDULING ORDER FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE FIL & SCANNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE & ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 163.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wiggins, John