This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 07/16/2022 at 16:07:45 (UTC).

INDIAN OAKS, Plaintiff, v. JEANETTE STALLINGS, Defendant.

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 INDIAN OAKS, Plaintiff filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JEANETTE STALLINGS, Defendant. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigars, Jason. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-62

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Seigars, Jason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INDIAN OAKS APARTMENTS

Defendant

Stallings, Jeannette

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT

01/18/2022: AFFIDAVIT

RETURN - JEANETTE STALLINGS PERSONALLY 1/21/22

01/21/2022: RETURN - JEANETTE STALLINGS PERSONALLY 1/21/22

JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

04/20/2022: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DISMISSAL

05/24/2022: DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jason Seigars

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: DISMISSED; Other; Party Details; Defendant: Stallings, Jeannette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCode: DISPDNC; Description: DISMISSAL; Count: 1; Party: Stallings, Jeannette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISM; Description: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jason Seigars

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SEIGARS: PLTF/PRESENT; DEFT/PRESENT; PLTF REQUESTS TO VACATE ORDER OF POSSESSION; GRANTED; CONT FOR HEARING JUNE 22, 22 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SEIGARS: PLTF/PRESENT; DEFT/FTA; PROPERTY ABANDONED POSSESSION ONLY 04-20-22 @ 10:30 AM; RETURN FOR STATUS 05-11-22 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jason Seigars

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: JEDF; Description: JOURNAL ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • HearingEvent: CLAIMS / HEARING; Docket: Jason Seigars

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE SEIGARS: PLTF/DEFT PRESENT; CONT TO 2-23-22 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: RET; Description: RETURN - JEANETTE STALLINGS PERSONALLY 1/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-510548 ON 01/18/2022. PAYOR: INDIAN OAKS APTS LLC TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 58.00. LINE ITEMS: SC-2022-62: $45.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. SC-2022-62: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. SC-2022-62: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE SEIGARS, JASON TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFDC1; Description: AFFIDAVIT; Amount: $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: SCFED1; Description: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER $1455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SMALL CLAIMS INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: FORCIBLE ENTRY & DETAINER $1455(SCFED1); Filed By: INDIAN OAKS APARTMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less