This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 05/14/2022 at 08:42:18 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Estates of John Earl Bunch Sr and Rosalee Gene Bunch both Deceased

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 In the Matter of the Estates of John Earl Bunch Sr and Rosalee Gene Bunch both Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas, Katherine E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****21-3

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas, Katherine E.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Coleman, Dawn

Decedents

Bunch, Rosalee Gene

Bunch, John Earl Sr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Baker, William James

P.O. Box 668

Stillwater, OK 74076

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

01/05/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES (JUDGE THOMAS)

01/19/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES (JUDGE THOMAS)

TESTIMONY OF PETITIONER ON PROBATE

01/19/2021: TESTIMONY OF PETITIONER ON PROBATE

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

01/19/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING HEARING

01/05/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING HEARING

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION (JUDGE THOMAS)

01/19/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION (JUDGE THOMAS)

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

01/05/2021: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

NOTICE TO CREDITORS OF THE DECEDENT MARY JOANN FOWLER AND CHARLES L FOWLER

01/25/2022: NOTICE TO CREDITORS OF THE DECEDENT MARY JOANN FOWLER AND CHARLES L FOWLER

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

01/25/2022: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY

01/25/2022: LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY

TESTIMONY OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

01/25/2022: TESTIMONY OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ISSUING LETTERS

01/25/2022: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ISSUING LETTERS

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

01/25/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

RELEASE OF CREDITOR'S CREDITOR

08/09/2021: RELEASE OF CREDITOR'S CREDITOR

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

08/02/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

DECREE OF SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DISTRIBUTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF REMAINING ESTATE,AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

07/27/2021: DECREE OF SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DISTRIBUTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF REMAINING ESTATE,AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATES AND FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

07/01/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF ESTATES AND FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, TOGETHER WITH PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF REMAINING ESTATE AND FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

07/01/2021: FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, TOGETHER WITH PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF REMAINING ESTATE AND FOR DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOTC; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS OF THE DECEDENT MARY JOANN FOWLER AND CHARLES L FOWLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: LTA; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: LTL; Description: LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEST; Description: TESTIMONY OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OAW; Description: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ISSUING LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: REL; Description: RELEASE OF CREDITOR'S CREDITOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: Order and Notice Setting Hearing on final account, petition for distribution of estates and for discharge of personal representative; Party: Coleman,Dawn; Docket: Katherine E. Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DECR; Description: DECREE OF SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DISTRIBUTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF REMAINING ESTATE,AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: Bunch, John Earl Sr; Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less