This case was last updated from Canadian County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 09:27:06 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATES OF CARL ELVIN STERLING AND DONNA JANE STERLING BOTH DECEASED.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATES OF CARL ELVIN STERLING AND DONNA JANE STERLING BOTH DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Canadian County Courts, Canadian County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Hesse, Paul. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2-15

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Canadian, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Hesse, Paul

 

Party Details

Petitioner

STERLING, BARRY CARL

Defendant

THE ESTATES OF CARL ELVIN STERLING AND DONNA JANE STERLING BOTH DECEASED

Decedents

STERLING, CARL ELVIN

STERLING, DONNA JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

TRAVIS, ANGELA

Attorney at EVANS & DAVIS

211 N. Broadway

Edmond, OK 73034

 

Court Documents

PROBATE INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE OF WILLS, FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR A JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

01/20/2022: PROBATE INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE OF WILLS, FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR A JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE OF WILLS, FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES FILED

01/20/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE OF WILLS, FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES, AND LEGATEES FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE OF WILLS, FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR A JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

01/20/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE OF WILLS, FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR A JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

01/24/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED

02/15/2022: PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED

ORDER ADMITTING WILLS TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

02/16/2022: ORDER ADMITTING WILLS TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED

02/16/2022: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED

NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

02/16/2022: NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

02/17/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

ELECTION BY RONALD ELVIN STERLING REGARDING OPTION IN WILL TO TAKE HOME AS DISTRIBUTION FILED

04/25/2022: ELECTION BY RONALD ELVIN STERLING REGARDING OPTION IN WILL TO TAKE HOME AS DISTRIBUTION FILED

ESTATE INVENTORY FILED

05/02/2022: ESTATE INVENTORY FILED

FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED

06/22/2022: FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED

ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED

06/22/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, AND FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED

06/22/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, AND FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACCOUNT; Party: STERLING,BARRYCARL; Docket: Paul Hesse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOH; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, AND FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED; Party: STERLING, BARRY CARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR HEARING PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, PETITION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED; Party: STERLING, BARRY CARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAC; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, FOR ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS, FOR DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE FILED; Party: STERLING, BARRY CARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ESTATE INVENTORY FILED; Party: STERLING, BARRY CARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ELECTION BY RONALD ELVIN STERLING REGARDING OPTION IN WILL TO TAKE HOME AS DISTRIBUTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION//FILED; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingEvent: PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE OF WILLS,FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS,DEVISEES AND LEGATEES; Docket: Paul Hesse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: LETTERS FILED; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: STERLING, DONNA JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING. // PETITION FOR JOINT PROBATE OF WILLS, FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR A JUDICIAL DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES FILED; Party: STERLING, BARRY CARL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: STERLING, BARRY CARL

    Read MoreRead Less