This case was last updated from Jackson County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 20:39:45 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF WANDA LEE ROBERSON, ET. AL., DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF WANDA LEE ROBERSON, , DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jackson County Courts, Jackson County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is MARSH, RICK A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jackson, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

MARSH, RICK A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF

ROBERSON, RONEY D.

ROBERSON, WANDA LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DUFFY, MICHAEL K.

Po Drawer 953, 1000 N. Main

Altus, OK 73522

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADM/TEST UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF HEARING RETURN OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF HEARING RETURN OF SALE UNDER POWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: POWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FIXING DATE FOR HEARING RETURN OF SALE UNDER

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less