This case was last updated from Garfield County Courts on 09/27/2022 at 14:59:32 (UTC).

Estate of TRACY EUGENE PHILPOT, Deceased,

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Estate of TRACY EUGENE PHILPOT, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Garfield County Courts, Garfield County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Newby, Tom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-117

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Garfield, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Newby, Tom

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ECKHARDT, DARLA DEANN

Decedent

PHILPOT, TRACY EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAMUNYON, JUSTIN

118 N Independence

Enid, OK 73701

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, REQUEST TO WAIVE INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL

06/23/2022: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, REQUEST TO WAIVE INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- ORDER/NOTICE SETTING HEARING #26011 (LEGAL NEWS)

07/06/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- ORDER/NOTICE SETTING HEARING #26011 (LEGAL NEWS)

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

06/24/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

WRITTEN TESTIMONY OF PETITIONER

06/23/2022: WRITTEN TESTIMONY OF PETITIONER

ORDER SETTING HEARING AND NOTICE OF HEARING HEA

06/23/2022: ORDER SETTING HEARING AND NOTICE OF HEARING HEA

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER ISSUING LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

07/18/2022: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER ISSUING LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER ISSUING LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

07/20/2022: NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER ISSUING LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION- DARLA ECKHARDT

07/20/2022: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION- DARLA ECKHARDT

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

09/09/2022: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE TO CREDITORS #26226 (LEGAL NEWS)

09/21/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE TO CREDITORS #26226 (LEGAL NEWS)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE TO CREDITORS #26226 (LEGAL NEWS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOTC; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: LTA; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION- DARLA ECKHARDT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ORAP; Description: NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER ISSUING LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingEvent: HEARING; Docket: Tom Newby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: ORAP; Description: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND ORDER ISSUING LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION- ORDER/NOTICE SETTING HEARING #26011 (LEGAL NEWS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2022-521432 ON 06/23/2022. PAYOR: LAMUNYON LAW FIRM TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 214.14. LINE ITEMS: PB-2022-117: $135.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. PB-2022-117: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. PB-2022-117: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. PB-2022-117: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. PB-2022-117: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2022-117: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. PB-2022-117: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. PB-2022-117: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. PB-2022-117: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2022-117: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. PB-2022-117: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. PB-2022-117: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE NEWBY, TOM TO THIS CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, REQUEST TO WAIVE INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Disposed: Pending.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMUNYON, JUSTIN