This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 02/21/2023 at 18:25:13 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF TRACY A WILLIS, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/24/2023 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF TRACY A WILLIS, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Tulsa, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Riesen, Tom. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-104

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Riesen, Tom

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Willis, Robin K

Decedent

Willis, Tracy A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rodgers, Jeff

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTAIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

01/24/2023: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTAIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

01/24/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES (WITH LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF TRACY A. WILLIS ATTACHED)

01/24/2023: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES (WITH LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF TRACY A. WILLIS ATTACHED)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION JOURNAL RECORD $31.80 PAID DIRECT

01/27/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION JOURNAL RECORD $31.80 PAID DIRECT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION/JOURNAL RECORD $31.65 PAID DIRECT

02/10/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/JOURNAL RECORD $31.65 PAID DIRECT

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED TO ROBIN K. WILLIS

02/15/2023: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED TO ROBIN K. WILLIS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

02/15/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

02/15/2023: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

02/15/2023: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

 

Docket Entries

02/15/2023

HearingEvent: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL; Docket: Tom Riesen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DispositionDisposition; Disposed: LETTERS FILED; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Willis, Tracy A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023

DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE RIESEN - ATTY JEFF RODGERS APPEAR COURT ISSUE ORDER ADMITTING WILL INTO PROBATE. COURT ISSUE LETTERS APPOINTING PERSONAL REP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: OAW; Description: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINING HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: NOTC; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: ANM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: DISPLTF; Description: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED TO ROBIN K. WILLIS; Count: 1; Party: Willis, Tracy A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION/JOURNAL RECORD $31.65 PAID DIRECT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION JOURNAL RECORD $31.80 PAID DIRECT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: ACCOUNT; Description: RECEIPT # 2023-5338674 ON 01/24/2023. PAYOR: JEFF RODGERS ATTORNEY AT LAW TOTAL AMOUNT PAID: $ 214.14. LINE ITEMS: PB-2023-104: $135.00 ON AC01 CLERK FEES. PB-2023-104: $6.00 ON AC23 LAW LIBRARY FEE CIVIL AND CRIMINAL. PB-2023-104: $1.66 ON AC31 COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND. PB-2023-104: $5.00 ON AC58 OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES. PB-2023-104: $1.55 ON AC59 COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2023-104: $7.00 ON AC64 DISPUTE MEDIATION FEES CIVIL ONLY. PB-2023-104: $0.45 ON AC65 STATE JUDICIAL REVOLVING FUND, INTERPRETER SVCS. PB-2023-104: $2.48 ON AC67 DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND. PB-2023-104: $25.00 ON AC79 OCIS REVOLVING FUND. PB-2023-104: $10.00 ON AC81 LENGTHY TRIAL FUND. PB-2023-104: $10.00 ON AC88 SHERIFFS SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY. PB-2023-104: $10.00 ON AC89 COURT CLERK'S RECORDS MANAGEMENT AND PRESERVATION FEE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
01/24/2023

DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less