This case was last updated from Okmulgee County Courts on 04/06/2022 at 07:07:59 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF THOMAS WILLIAM GRIMMETT, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF THOMAS WILLIAM GRIMMETT, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Okmulgee County Courts, Okmulgee County Courthouse - Okmulgee Division located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERING, CYNTHIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0015

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Okmulgee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERING, CYNTHIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRIMMETT, THOMAS WILLIAM

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF THOMAS WILLIAM GRIMMETT, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BARKSDALE, BILL

310 E 7Th St

Okmulgee, OK 74447

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

03/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

03/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

03/09/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND

03/09/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING ESTATE TAXES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE (PICKERING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPLLICATION FOR AUTHORIZATIN TO SELL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE WITHOUT FURTHER JUDICIAL INTERVENTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE, GRANT OR CONVEYANCE BY PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINING HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: HEIRS; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND FOR DETERMINATION OF; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FOR APPOINTMENT; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARKSDALE, BILL