This case was last updated from Pottawatomie County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 14:04:27 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF SUE ANN MCGOWAN, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF SUE ANN MCGOWAN, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pottawatomie County Courts, Pottawatomie County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0019

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pottawatomie, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CANAVAN, JOHN G. JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGOWAN, SUE ANN

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF SUE ANN MCGOWAN, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BRACKEEN, CRAIG N.

102 East Highland

Shawnee, OK 74801

 

Court Documents

FILE PETITION

02/22/2021: FILE PETITION

FILE EXHIBIT "A" TO PETITION: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

02/22/2021: FILE EXHIBIT "A" TO PETITION: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION TO PROBATE WILL AND

02/22/2021: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION TO PROBATE WILL AND

FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

03/22/2021: FILE ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

FILE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY- BYRON MCGOWAN

03/22/2021: FILE LETTERS TESTAMENTARY- BYRON MCGOWAN

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

03/22/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING NOTICE TO CREDITORS

FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS TO PRESENT CLAIMS

03/22/2021: FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS TO PRESENT CLAIMS

FILE INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

04/08/2021: FILE INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- SEAN MCGOWAN

05/27/2021: FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- SEAN MCGOWAN

FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- AARON MCGOWAN

05/27/2021: FILE CONSENT AND WAIVER- AARON MCGOWAN

FILE NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED PETITION FOR

06/16/2021: FILE NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED PETITION FOR

FILE AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING HEIRS

06/28/2021: FILE AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING HEIRS

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

06/28/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

06/28/2021: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

FILE ORDER ALLOWING DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND

07/12/2021: FILE ORDER ALLOWING DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER ALLOWING DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less