This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 17:26:19 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF SOPHIA JEAN WALTERS, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF SOPHIA JEAN WALTERS, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is OLSEN, HONORABLE TIMOTHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0049

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

OLSEN, HONORABLE TIMOTHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTERS, SOPHIA JEAN

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF SOPHIA JEAN WALTERS, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GALEY, YVONNE DECKER

Attorney at OKLAHOMA INDIAN LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

4200 Perimeter Center Dr., Ste 222

Oklahoma City, OK 73112

INMAN, BRANDY L.

7906 East 33Rd St, Suite 100

Tulsa, OK 74145

 

Court Documents

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

07/23/2018: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL SERVICE; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING - OLSEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE, DECREE DETERMINING HEIRS, DECREE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICES; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER FOR AND NOTICE OF HEARING FINAL FINAL ACCOUNT,

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, WAIVER OF BOND AND INVENTORY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALEY, YVONNE DECKER