This case was last updated from Lincoln County Courts on 04/14/2022 at 04:36:20 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF SONDRA WYNELL POWER, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF SONDRA WYNELL POWER, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Lincoln County Courts, Lincoln County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is ASHWOOD, CYNTHIA FERRELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0040

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Lincoln, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

ASHWOOD, CYNTHIA FERRELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWER, SONDRA WYNELL

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF SONDRA WYNELL POWER, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

UPTON, GREGORY A

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Po Box 337

Chandler, OK 74834

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GRANT LEASE, MORTGAGE OR ENCUMBER PROPERTY: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER AUTHORIZING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE TO SELL,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR ORDER OF SALE: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT & WAIVER (ELLA LADAWN LANE): FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT & WAIVER (SONJA DUBROW): FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT & WAIVER (ANTHONY NEELY): FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COSTS; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less