This case was last updated from Tulsa County Courts on 04/29/2022 at 06:56:48 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: SHELLY BERRYHILL, AKA STEVE DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF SHELLY BERRYHILL, AKA STEVE DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Tulsa County Courts, Tulsa County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Glassco, Kurt G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-443

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Tulsa, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Glassco, Kurt G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BERRYHILL, JEFF

Decedent

BERRYHILL, SHELLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BUNDREN, MARY R

900 Reunion Center, 9 E. 4Th St

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - JEFF BERRYHILL

07/03/2018: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - JEFF BERRYHILL

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL

07/01/2021: INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL

ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS

07/03/2018: ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS

LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION - JEFF BERRYHILL

06/15/2018: LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION - JEFF BERRYHILL

APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

07/01/2021: APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS

ORDER TO DISTRIBUTE FUNDS

12/06/2018: ORDER TO DISTRIBUTE FUNDS

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - TW - 7/7/18

07/18/2018: PROOF OF PUBLICATION - TW - 7/7/18

ORDER FOR PARTIAL DISTRIBUTION TO THE HEIRS

12/10/2020: ORDER FOR PARTIAL DISTRIBUTION TO THE HEIRS

NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS - JULY 3, 2018 - 10:30 A.M. - NO PUB

06/14/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS - JULY 3, 2018 - 10:30 A.M. - NO PUB

ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND ACCOUNTING, APPROVAL OF THE SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR'S COMMISSION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND DISCHARGE OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

09/08/2021: ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND ACCOUNTING, APPROVAL OF THE SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR'S COMMISSION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND DISCHARGE OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

SUPPLEMENT TO THE FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AWARD OF COMMISSION, AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES, DISTRIBUTION OF THE ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

09/08/2021: SUPPLEMENT TO THE FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AWARD OF COMMISSION, AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES, DISTRIBUTION OF THE ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

07/23/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AMENDED ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING FOR FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING - TULSA WORLD

07/22/2021: AMENDED ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING FOR FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING - TULSA WORLD

ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR FINAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES GUARDIAN COMPENSATION , AND DISCHARGE - SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 AT 10:00 AM

07/22/2021: ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR FINAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES GUARDIAN COMPENSATION , AND DISCHARGE - SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 AT 10:00 AM

MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR FINAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES ADMINISTRATOR COMMISSION, AND DISCHARGE

07/21/2021: MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR FINAL ACCOUNT ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES ADMINISTRATOR COMMISSION, AND DISCHARGE

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

07/12/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

07/08/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING - JULY 28, 2021 @ 10:00AM

07/08/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING - JULY 28, 2021 @ 10:00AM

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: FINAL ACCT ---- ATTY: M. BUNDREN, PR; Docket: Kurt G Glassco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Petitioner: BERRYHILL, JEFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND ACCOUNTING, APPROVAL OF THE SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR'S COMMISSION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS AND DISCHARGE OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: SUPPLEMENT TO THE FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, AWARD OF COMMISSION, AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEY FEES, DISTRIBUTION OF THE ESTATE AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCode: DISPFO; Description: JUDGE KURT G. GLASSCO: CASE CALLED IN HALLWAY WITH NO RESPONSE. NO ONE APPEARS. THERE ARE NO OBJECTIONS. HEARING HELD. ORDER APPROVING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, FINAL DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND ACCOUNTING, APPROVAL OF THE SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR'S COMMISION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND DISCHARGE OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, ENTERED. CLERK TO FILE ORDER.; Count: 1; Party: BERRYHILL, JEFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AM; Description: AMENDED ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING FOR FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING - TULSA WORLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OCON; Description: ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR FINAL ACCOUNT; ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES; GUARDIAN COMPENSATION , AND DISCHARGE - SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 AT 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE KURT G. GLASSCO: ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR FINAL ACCOUNT; ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES; GUARDIAN COMPENSATION, AND DISCHARGE, ENTERED. HEARING CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 8, 2021 @ 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: MOCON; Description: MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING FOR FINAL ACCOUNT; ATTORNEY FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES; ADMINISTRATOR COMMISSION, AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR AND PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DETERMINATION OF HEIRS; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: BERRYHILL, JEFF

    Read MoreRead Less