This case was last updated from Pawnee County Courts on 07/18/2022 at 03:19:51 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF SHARON GAIL MARTIN, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF SHARON GAIL MARTIN, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Pawnee County Courts, Pawnee County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is PICKERILL, PATRICK M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0039

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Pawnee, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

PICKERILL, PATRICK M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTIN, SHARON GAIL

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF SHARON GAIL MARTIN, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KELLY, ALBERT C

Po Box 995

Bristow, OK 74010

 

Court Documents

FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

08/06/2021: FILE ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF

FILE ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE,

09/01/2021: FILE ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE,

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRS AT LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING (NO CREDITORS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION PAID DIRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT TO DISTRIBUTION OF ASSETS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE DISCLAIMER, WAIVER OF RIGHTS, ASSIGNMENT, AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: LETTERS ADMINISTRATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: STATE JUDICIAL REV. FUND INTERPRETER & TRANSLATOR SERVICES; Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE PETITION OF PROBATE; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less