This case was last updated from Grady County Courts on 03/15/2022 at 10:24:18 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF SARAH JANE DODDS, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF SARAH JANE DODDS, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Grady County Courts, Grady County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, Z. JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0045

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Grady, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, Z. JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DODDS, SARAH JANE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF SARAH JANE DODDS, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FEIST, PHILIP R.

321 S Boston Ave Suite 800

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

PETITION

03/10/2021: PETITION

ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING - 4-12-2021 8:45AM

03/19/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING - 4-12-2021 8:45AM

ORDER & NOTICE FOR HEARING - 5-11-21 AT 8:45 AM

04/12/2021: ORDER & NOTICE FOR HEARING - 5-11-21 AT 8:45 AM

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF HEARING

04/26/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

05/11/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REVISED NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF HEIRS, DEVISEES AND LEGATEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DETERMINATION OF IDENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE, APPOINTMENT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND - EFFECTIVE 1-5-2005; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less