This case was last updated from Delaware County Courts on 04/16/2022 at 03:32:52 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF SANDRA LEE ANDERSON, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF SANDRA LEE ANDERSON, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Delaware County Courts, Delaware County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0084

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Delaware, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

CRUTCHFIELD, DAVID

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON, SANDRA LEE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF SANDRA LEE ANDERSON, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

THOMAS, JOHN W.

Attorney at DAVIS & THOMPSON

P.O. Box 487

Jay, OK 74346

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

11/19/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION

CONSENT AND WAIVER - TONA MCCLAIN

02/11/2022: CONSENT AND WAIVER - TONA MCCLAIN

CONSENT AND WAIVER - TABITHA ALLEN

02/11/2022: CONSENT AND WAIVER - TABITHA ALLEN

PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF

02/11/2022: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF

CLAIM - DISALLOWED

03/29/2022: CLAIM - DISALLOWED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CLAIM - DISALLOWED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: GENERAL INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER OF AUTHORITY TO SELL PROPERTY, WAIVE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: INVENTORY AND ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AUTHORITY TO SELL PROPERTY WAIVE FILING GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT AND WAIVER - TONYA CLIFFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT AND WAIVER - TABITHA ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT AND WAIVER - TONA MCCLAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CONSENT AND WAIVER - TAMERIA MIKELL

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 7/1/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION, AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE,; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less