This case was last updated from Bryan County Courts on 04/07/2022 at 13:08:45 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF ROBERT RICHARD DEMEULENAERE, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF ROBERT RICHARD DEMEULENAERE, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Bryan County Courts, Bryan County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0061

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Bryan, Oklahoma

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEMEULENAERE, ROBERT RICHARD

Other

DEMEULENAERE, DOTTIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JONES, CHRIS D.

Attorney at JONES LAW PC

113 N 3Rd Ave

Durant, OK 74701

 

Court Documents

FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

07/06/2018: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

FILE GENERAL INVENTORY

09/06/2018: FILE GENERAL INVENTORY

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: XHRG ON PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • HearingEvent: FINAL DECREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CM: PER ORDERS RP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRSHIP, DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE FINAL ACCOUNT AND PETITION FOR ORDER ALLOWING

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OCIS FEE; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DOCKET FEE; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less