This case was last updated from Oklahoma County Courts on 04/25/2022 at 14:54:26 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF ROBERT LEE BENNETT, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF ROBERT LEE BENNETT, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Oklahoma County Courts, Oklahoma County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirkpatrick, K. Nikki and Dishman, C. Brent. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-667

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Oklahoma, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judges

Kirkpatrick, K. Nikki

Dishman, C. Brent

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Looney, Alan J

Tulsa, OK 74104

Decedent

Bennett, Robert Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LOONEY, ALAN J

1416 Terrace Drive

Tulsa, OK 74104

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

05/04/2021: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

05/04/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

NOMINATION OF ADMINISTRATOR

05/04/2021: NOMINATION OF ADMINISTRATOR

AFFIDAVIT OF TESTIMONY OF ALAN J. LOONEY

05/04/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF TESTIMONY OF ALAN J. LOONEY

PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #11998073--PUBLISHER'S FEE $45.77---PAID DIRECT

05/06/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #11998073--PUBLISHER'S FEE $45.77---PAID DIRECT

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

06/02/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - ATTY MICHAEL SEYMOUR ON BEHALF OF ALAN LOONEY PETITONER APPOINTED AS PERSONAL REP, HEIRS DETERMINED, ALL PER ORDER APPOINTING LETTERS OF ADMIN ENTERED ALL W/O OBJ

06/09/2021: JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - ATTY MICHAEL SEYMOUR ON BEHALF OF ALAN LOONEY PETITONER APPOINTED AS PERSONAL REP, HEIRS DETERMINED, ALL PER ORDER APPOINTING LETTERS OF ADMIN ENTERED ALL W/O OBJ

LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO ALAN J LOONEY/ JUDGE KIRKPATRICK

06/09/2021: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO ALAN J LOONEY/ JUDGE KIRKPATRICK

NOTICE TO CREDITORS

06/09/2021: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

06/09/2021: ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12009538---PUBLISHER'S FEE $54.11---PAID DIRECT

06/21/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12009538---PUBLISHER'S FEE $54.11---PAID DIRECT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 119596

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION--JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #12009538---PUBLISHER'S FEE $54.11---PAID DIRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Docket: K. Nikki Kirkpatrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: OTHER; Judge; Party Details; Deceased: Bennett, Robert Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: O; Description: ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: NOTC; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: DISPOTHER; Description: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION ISSUED TO ALAN J LOONEY/ JUDGE KIRKPATRICK; Count: 1; Party: Bennett, Robert Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: CTFREE; Description: JUDGE KIRKPATRICK - ATTY MICHAEL SEYMOUR ON BEHALF OF ALAN LOONEY PETITONER APPOINTED AS PERSONAL REP, HEIRS DETERMINED, ALL PER ORDER APPOINTING; LETTERS OF ADMIN ENTERED ALL W/O OBJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION---JOURNAL RECORD---ORD #11998073--PUBLISHER'S FEE $45.77---PAID DIRECT

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less