This case was last updated from Haskell County Courts on 10/24/2022 at 06:42:49 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF RICHARD WEISDORF, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 03/23/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF RICHARD WEISDORF, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Haskell County Courts, Haskell County Courthouse located in Seminole, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is HENDERSON, BRIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0012

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Haskell, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

HENDERSON, BRIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEISDORF, RICHARD

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF RICHARD WEISDORF, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BLANKENSHIP, CHRIS

Po Box 69

Stigler, OK 74462

 

Court Documents

FILE AND ENTER PETITION

03/23/2021: FILE AND ENTER PETITION

AFFIDAVIT/PUBLICATION FILED

04/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT/PUBLICATION FILED

AFFIDAVIT/PUBLICATION FILED

02/14/2022: AFFIDAVIT/PUBLICATION FILED

ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

12/16/2021: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

PUBLICATION FILED

12/16/2021: PUBLICATION FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

12/10/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING RETURN OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

11/30/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING RETURN OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

ORDER FOR HEARING RETURN OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

11/30/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING RETURN OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

RETURN OF SALE OF REAL PPTY

11/30/2021: RETURN OF SALE OF REAL PPTY

OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JOYCE WEISDORF

04/22/2021: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE JOYCE WEISDORF

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED

04/22/2021: LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED

ORDER ADMITTING WILL, DETERMINING HEIRS, AND APPOINTING

04/22/2021: ORDER ADMITTING WILL, DETERMINING HEIRS, AND APPOINTING

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

04/22/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED (4-22-21 @ 10 AM)

03/24/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED (4-22-21 @ 10 AM)

ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED (4-22-21 @ 10 AM)

03/24/2021: ORDER SETTING HEARING FILED (4-22-21 @ 10 AM)

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN FILED

12/21/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN FILED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT/PUBLICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: RETURN OF SALE OF PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PUBLICATION FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AJE: COST DUE TO CARD ALLOCATION FEE; Amount: $ 2.17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.04

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ -0.02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CHCS; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PDLTF; Amount: $ 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less