This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/21/2022 at 20:44:25 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF RICHARD E. ORTLEY, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF RICHARD E ORTLEY, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Seminole County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is BUTNER, HONORABLE BRETT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0008

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

BUTNER, HONORABLE BRETT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTLEY, RICHARD E.

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF RICHARD E. ORTLEY, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PITTS, RYAN H.

1701 E. Highway

Holdenville, OK 74848

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, AND

01/20/2022: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, AND

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, LETTERS

01/20/2022: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, LETTERS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: CREDITORS OF DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND OF NON-MAILING OF NOTICE TO; Document Available at Court Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 239

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OF REAL AND PERSONAL PROPERTY UNDER 58 O.S. SECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER APPROVING CONSENTS AND PETITION AUTHROIZING SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.98

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: (Entry with fee only); Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DETERMINATION OF HEIRS; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, AND; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less