This case was last updated from Marshall County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 05:56:30 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: THE ESTATE OF REBECCA LANE SPARKS, DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF REBECCA LANE SPARKS, DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Marshall County Courts, Marshall County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, GREGORY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0057

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Marshall, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, GREGORY L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPARKS, REBECCA LANE

Defendant

: THE ESTATE OF REBECCA LANE SPARKS, DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SPEER, KRISTEN L.

Attorney at LITTLE LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 618

Madill, OK 73446

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

09/08/2021: ORDER FOR HEARING PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL,

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

09/29/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MAILING

DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT BY NON-RESIDENT PERSONAL

09/29/2021: DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT BY NON-RESIDENT PERSONAL

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

09/30/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF

12/29/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OFFICIAL AD PROOF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: PROBATE DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: COURT ORDER PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: EXPENSE, AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT, DECREE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COSTS, AND EXPENSES, AND DISCHARGE OF PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION, APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEES,

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF COJC TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: 10% OF CASA TO COURT CLERK REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 0.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OK COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LENGTHY TRIAL FUND; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/04; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: LAW LIBRARY ASSESSMENT; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: FILE AND ENTER PETITION; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less