This case was last updated from Payne County Courts on 01/18/2022 at 07:22:34 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Estate of Raymond Darrel Eikenbary Deceased

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 In the Matter of the Estate of Raymond Darrel Eikenbary Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Payne County Courts, Payne County Courthouse located in Woodward, Oklahoma. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas, Katherine E.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8-39

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Payne, Oklahoma

Judge Details

Judge

Thomas, Katherine E.

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Eikenbary, Raymond Dale

Guenther, Pam

Decedent

Eikenbary, Raymond Darrel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Devlin, Matthew S

614 S. West Streetpo Box 1243

Stillwater, OK 74076

 

Court Documents

LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY

06/26/2018: LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY

ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

02/25/2021: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

WAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND WAIVER OF FILING GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

12/30/2020: WAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO SALE OF REAL PROPERTY AND WAIVER OF FILING GENERAL INVENTORY AND APPRAISEMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

06/26/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

02/25/2021: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

ORDER OF SALE

12/30/2020: ORDER OF SALE

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/30/2018: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

06/07/2018: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE

02/03/2021: ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING AND NON-MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAC; Description: ORDER ALLOWING FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINING HEIRS, DECREE OF DISTRIBUTION AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PP; Description: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: settlement of final account, determination of heirs, legatees and devisees and for the distribution of remaining estate; Party: Eikenbary,RaymondDarrel; Docket: Katherine E. Thomas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Disposed: FINAL ORDER; Judge; Party Details; Personal Representative: Guenther, Pam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: AFM; Description: AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: JUDGE THOMAS: THIS MATTER COMES ON FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE. PETITIONER APPEARS BY ATTORNEY, MATT DEVLIN. HEARING NO OBJECTIONS, THE COURT APPROVES AND ALLOWS THE FINAL ACCOUNTING, ENTERS THE FINAL DECREE DETERMINING HEIRS TO BE THOSE SET IN PETITION AND ORDERS DISTRIBUTION OF THE ESTATE. THE COURT DISCHARGES THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE.; Party: Eikenbary, Raymond Darrel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: OH; Description: ORDER AND NOTICE FIXING TIME FOR SETTLEMENT OF FINAL ACCOUNT, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS, LEGATEES AND DEVISEES AND FOR THE DISTRIBUTION OF REMAINING ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: GIA; Description: GENERAL INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: FAPDH; Description: FINAL ACCOUNT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION , DETERMINATION OF HEIRS AT LAW AND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: SSFCHSCPC; Description: SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE FOR COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER; Amount: $ 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCASA; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT APPOINTED SPECIAL ADVOCATES; Amount: $ 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCJC; Description: OKLAHOMA COUNCIL ON JUDICIAL COMPLAINTS REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 1.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: OCISR; Description: OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND; Amount: $ 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PFE7; Description: LAW LIBRARY FEE; Amount: $ 6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCode: PFE1; Description: PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL, APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, DETERMINATION OF HEIRS DEVISEES AND LEGATEES AND ISSUANCE OF LETTERS TESTAMENTARY; Amount: $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: DMFE; Description: DISPUTE MEDIATION FEE; Amount: $ 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: PROBATE; Description: PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCode: TEXT; Description: PROBATE INITIAL FILING.; Count: 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketIssue #1; Issue: PROBATE(PROBATE); Filed By: Eikenbary, Raymond Dale

    Read MoreRead Less